OR SB244 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Effective date, June 22, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes notification requirements of Department of Human Services regarding reported or suspected abuses, deficiencies, violations or failures of child-caring agency to comply with full compliance requirements and regarding reports of suspected or substantiated abuse of child in care. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to notifications required regarding child-caring agencies; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-04SenateEffective date, June 22, 2017.
2017-07-04SenateChapter 448, 2017 Laws.
2017-06-22SenateGovernor signed.
2017-06-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-06-13SenatePresident signed.
2017-06-12SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
2017-06-06HouseThird reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Johnson, McKeown, Nosse, Power, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Greenlick.
2017-06-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-31HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-30HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-26HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-25HouseSecond reading.
2017-05-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2017-05-18HouseWork Session held.
2017-05-04HouseWork Session held.
2017-04-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-03-02HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2017-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-02-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dembrow, Girod.
2017-02-21SenateCarried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent.
2017-02-16SenateCarried over to 02-21 by unanimous consent.
2017-02-14SenateSecond reading.
2017-02-13SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-02-06SenateWork Session held.
2017-02-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Human Services.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB244
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB244/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB244/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB244/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB244/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB244/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB244/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/24405
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=388674
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25973
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=414523
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=415608

Bill Comments

feedback