OR SB244 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date, January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to use moneys in Housing Development and Guarantee Account for housing for persons with low or very low income. Requires State Housing Council to adopt policy providing for distribution of General Housing Account moneys and investment revenue statewide with concentration in areas of state with greatest need for housing for persons with low or very low income.
Title
Relating to low income housing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Chapter 608, 2015 Laws. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 30. |
2015-06-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barreto, Esquivel, Johnson. |
2015-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-09 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-06-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2015-03-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |