OR SB236 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Early Learning Division to conduct study on use of suspension and expulsion in early childhood care and education programs and on efforts to reduce and prevent use of suspension and expulsion. Directs Early Learning Division to conduct study on use of suspension and expulsion in early childhood care and education programs and on efforts to reduce and prevent use of suspension and expulsion. Requires division to report results of study to appropriate interim committees of Legislative Assembly. Sunsets December 31, 2024. Prohibits early childhood care or education program that receives state public funds from Early Learning Division or that is certified or registered from suspending or expelling any child. Becomes operative July 1, 2026. Requires division to report on proposed implementation of prohibition to appropriate interim committees of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to discipline used in early learning; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill. Refer to Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill. Refer to Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 576, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-22 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boshart Davis. |
2021-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-06-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Rules. |
2021-05-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-24 | House | Informational Meeting held. |
2021-05-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Early Childhood. |
2021-05-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, President Courtney. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |