OR SB235 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Corrections to develop plan for providing equipment, connectivity and infrastructure necessary to ensure that adults in custody, in Coffee Creek Correctional Facility and Snake River Correctional Institution, have online access to certain education programs. Directs Department of Corrections to develop plan for providing equipment, connectivity and infrastructure necessary to ensure that adults in custody, in Coffee Creek Correctional Facility and Snake River Correctional Institution, have online access to certain education programs. Requires department to submit plan to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2021. Directs department to provide online access, in Coffee Creek Correctional Facility and Snake River Correctional Institution, to certain education programs no later than September 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to online access to education for adults in custody; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |