OR SB231 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Human Services to establish and maintain centralized child abuse reporting system. Directs Department of Human Services to establish and maintain centralized child abuse reporting system. Modifies mandatory child abuse reporting process. Permits certain child abuse reports to be made electronically. Removes references to designees of department receiving child abuse reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to abuse reporting.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-02SenateEffective date, January 1, 2024.
2023-06-02SenateChapter 132, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-30SenateGovernor signed.
2023-05-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-18SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-16HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Reschke.
2023-05-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Reynolds. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Boice, Cate, Goodwin, McIntire, Morgan, Reschke; Excused, 2--Breese-Iverson, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield.
2023-05-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-11HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-08HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-08HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-03HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-17HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-10HouseReferred to Early Childhood and Human Services.
2023-03-06HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-03-02SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 3--Findley, Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 3--Robinson, Steiner, Taylor.
2023-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2023-03-01SenateSubsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2023-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2023-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-20SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-15SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB231
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB231/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB231/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74273
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66198
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74223
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74839
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266882
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261012
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261903
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261812
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261857
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262200
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270113
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270628
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270684
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270854
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272371
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78970
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34367
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=559207
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35501
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=579825

Bill Comments

feedback