OR SB231 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Student Mental Health Support. Directs task force to investigate mental health issues and substance abuse disorders among students, with emphasis on college recruitment, retention and completion and how issues and disorders differ across different communities in this state. Requires task force to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to higher education no later than November 1, 2018. Sunsets December 31, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to mental health issues in higher education; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to General Government and Accountability then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to General Government and Accountability then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Chapter 643, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability, then Ways and Means. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to General Government and Accountability and then Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then General Government and Accountability, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |