OR SB228 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies additional circumstances under which Construction Contractors Board may revoke, suspend, condition or refuse to issue or reissue license for construction contractor, or impose civil penalty for violation of laws that regulate work of construction contractors in this state. Specifies additional circumstances under which Construction Contractors Board may revoke, suspend, condition or refuse to issue or reissue license for construction contractor, or impose civil penalty for violation of laws that regulate work of construction contractors in this state. Provides board with additional rulemaking powers related to obtaining or maintaining construction contractor license and resolving complaints. Requires licensed contractors to notify board within 10 days after change in status if contractor's status changes from exempt to nonexempt or from nonexempt to exempt. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to licensing for construction contractors; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-21SenateEffective date, September 24, 2023.
2023-07-21SenateChapter 277, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-13SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-20SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-15SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Anderson.
2023-06-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 21; Nays, 1--Smith DB; Absent, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Girod.
2023-05-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 6--Cate, Goodwin, Hieb, Levy B, Osborne, Reschke; Excused, 12--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Elmer, Evans, Helfrich, Javadi, McIntire, Morgan, Nelson, Scharf, Sosa, Wallan.
2023-05-24HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-23HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-22HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2023-05-17HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2023-02-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-02-13SenateThird reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Boquist, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 3--Gelser Blouin, Lieber, Thatcher.
2023-02-09SenateCarried over to 02-13 by unanimous consent.
2023-02-07SenateSecond reading.
2023-02-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-02-02SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-01-26SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-14SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB228
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB228/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB228/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB228/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB228/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24968
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66196
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73458
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73502
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73635
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259209
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269392
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/259708
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269417
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272231
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272471
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273298
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273899
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274007
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79650
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274066
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79737
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79782
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79880
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34243
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=555805
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35844
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=582327
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=586335

Bill Comments

feedback