OR SB228 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds representative of Department of Justice to membership of Oregon Homeland Security Council.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Homeland Security Council.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Judiciary be rescinded (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Judiciary be rescinded (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 282, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Greenlick. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Carried over to 02-26 by unanimous consent. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Judiciary be rescinded. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |