OR SB227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 518, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 518, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updates rulemaking procedures to reflect current practices and implementation of electronic database of administrative rules. Requires Secretary of State to electronically transmit to Legislative Counsel rules adopted, amended or repealed by state agency within 10 days of filing. Requires agencies to submit to Secretary of State reports of five-year rule reviews. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to state agency rulemaking; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 518, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2017-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-04-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Boquist; excused, 1--Winters. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |