OR SB219 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that contracting agency may not spend more than five percent of estimated contract price for procurement for services on conducting cost analysis as to whether contracting agency would incur less cost in conducting procurement than in performing services with contracting agency's own personnel or in making determination of whether performing services with contracting agency's own personnel is feasible.
Title
Relating to capping costs for required preliminary steps before conducting public procurements; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |