OR SB218 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Education and law enforcement agencies to make available to Teacher Standards and Practices Commission certain information received during investigation of suspected sexual conduct or child abuse. Requires Department of Education and law enforcement agencies to make available to Teacher Standards and Practices Commission certain information received during investigation of suspected sexual conduct or child abuse. Absolves commission of duty to investigate commission licensee when commission requires verification related to complaint and commission does not receive verification within 12 months of providing notice of verification requirement. Authorizes executive director of Teacher Standards and Practices Commission or executive director's designee to determine when to forward report of investigation of commission licensee to commission. Requires investigations related to certain violations to be reported to commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to investigations conducted by the Teacher Standards and Practices Commission.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-02SenateEffective date, January 1, 2024.
2023-06-02SenateChapter 131, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-30SenateGovernor signed.
2023-05-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-23SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Javadi.
2023-05-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-16HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-11HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-03HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-13HouseReferred to Education.
2023-04-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-04-11SenateThatcher, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
2023-04-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-04-10SenateCarried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-06SenateCarried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-05SenateCarried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-04SenateSecond reading.
2023-04-04SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-03-30SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Education.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB218
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB218/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB218/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77012
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73346
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75650
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77174
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264277
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264081
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268707
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268708
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268569
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271457
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271888
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272301
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272302
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272312
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78962
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34974
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=572432
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35518
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=580563

Bill Comments

feedback