OR SB214 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For purposes of personal income taxation, changes connection point from federal taxable income to federal adjusted gross income by eliminating allowance of itemized deductions or standard deduction. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to taxation; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB214 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB214/Introduced |