OR SB213 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voids certain provisions in construction agreement requiring design professional to defend or indemnify against certain claims except to extent design professional's negligence caused indemnitee's damages. Voids certain provisions in construction agreement requiring design professional to defend or indemnify against certain claims except to extent design professional's negligence caused indemnitee's damages. Provides that design professional may not be held liable for attorney fees incurred to defend claims against indemnitee before design professional's fault is determined.
Title
Relating to design professionals.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB213 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB213/Introduced |