OR SB211 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of State Police to maintain staffing level of at least 15 patrol troopers per 100,000 residents of this state, beginning January 1, 2030. Directs Department of State Police to maintain staffing level of at least 15 patrol troopers per 100,000 residents of this state, beginning January 1, 2030.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to patrol trooper staffing levels for Department of State Police troopers.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2021-02-10SenateRecommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
2021-02-04SenateWork Session held.
2021-01-27SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback