OR SB210 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Work Session held.
Pending: Senate Labor and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that certain banking institutions may pay dividend in amount greater than previous statutory maximum amount if such payment is approved by Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services. Provides that certain banking institutions may pay dividend in amount greater than previous statutory maximum amount if such payment is approved by Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services. Modifies definition of "capital" for purposes of loan and other obligation limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to banking institutions.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09SenateWork Session held.
2021-01-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback