OR SB209 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain persons from disclosing records of sexual orientation, gender identity or gender expression of child or ward. Requires Department of Human Services to study options for protecting from disclosure in certain proceedings information regarding sexual orientation, gender identity and gender expression of children in department's custody. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services not later than September 15, 2024.] Sunsets January 2, 2025.] Prohibits certain persons from disclosing records of sexual orientation, gender identity or gender expression of child or ward. Creates exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to confidentiality of child welfare records.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-02SenateEffective date, January 1, 2024.
2023-06-02SenateChapter 129, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-30SenateGovernor signed.
2023-05-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-18SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-16HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Elmer.
2023-05-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Nelson. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Boice, Boshart Davis, Cate, Conrad, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 2--Breese-Iverson, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield.
2023-05-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-11HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-08HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-08HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-03HouseWork Session held.
2023-04-17HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-13HouseReferred to Early Childhood and Human Services.
2023-04-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-04-10SenateSmith DB granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay.
2023-04-10SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Hansell.
2023-04-06SenateCarried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-05SenateCarried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-04SenateCarried over to 04-05 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-03SenateSecond reading.
2023-03-31SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-27SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-15SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Human Services.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB209
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB209/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB209/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB209/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB209/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22705
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23409
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76626
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66182
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76768
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76851
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266877
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261043
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266913
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267285
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267556
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77478
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270112
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270626
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270683
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270852
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272369
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78941
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34817
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=572166
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35502
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=579824

Bill Comments

feedback