OR SB204 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 18; Nays, 11--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adds civilian or community oversight boards, agencies and review bodies designated by municipalities or law enforcement agencies to definition of "criminal justice agency." Allows civilian or community oversight boards, agencies and review bodies to access Law Enforcement Data System. Adds civilian or community oversight boards, agencies and review bodies designated by municipalities or law enforcement agencies to definition of "criminal justice agency." Allows civilian or community oversight boards, agencies and review bodies to access Law Enforcement Data System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to criminal justice agencies.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 18; Nays, 11--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-14HouseThird reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 22--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Leif, Levy, McLain, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Hayden, Lewis, Valderrama.
2021-06-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-07HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-05-27HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-07HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-07SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 2--Johnson, Thatcher.
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-16SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB204
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB204/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB204/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB204/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB204/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB204/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB204/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31417
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=513411
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32735
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=530290
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=531117

Bill Comments 750

feedback