OR SB204 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, June 17, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Effective date, June 17, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health care; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to health care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Rep. Tina Kotek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Effective date, June 17, 2011. | |
2011-06-22 | Chapter 418, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-17 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-14 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-10 | President signed. | |
2011-06-09 | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-03 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Hoyle. | |
2011-06-02 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kotek, Freeman. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 7--Berger, Brewer, Garrard, Kennemer, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner; Absent, 1--Clem. | |
2011-06-02 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-31 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-05-27 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-18 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2011-05-03 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-05-02 | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-04-28 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-27 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-20 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-18 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |