OR SB199 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes State Fish and Wildlife Commission to establish by rule requirements or prohibitions concerning angling, taking, hunting, trapping or possessing of wildlife defined as predatory animal. Authorizes State Fish and Wildlife Commission to establish by rule requirements or prohibitions concerning angling, taking, hunting, trapping or possessing of wildlife defined as predatory animal.
Title
Relating to the protection of wildlife.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Natural Resources by order of the President. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |