OR SB197 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 479, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 479, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends applicability of education policies related to teen dating violence, domestic violence and sexual harassment to private schools. Extends applicability of education policies related to teen dating violence, domestic violence and sexual harassment to private schools. Authorizes person to bring action for injunction compelling private school to comply with certain laws related to sexual conduct or related to abuse of children. Establishes private cause of action if private school does not comply with court order compelling compliance.
Title
Relating to lawsuits.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | Chapter 479, 2021 Laws. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-09 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boshart Davis. |
2021-06-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--Nearman, Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Drazan, Rayfield, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-05-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 2--Girod, Johnson; Absent, 3--Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Boquist, Heard, Thomsen. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |