OR SB196 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that part-time faculty member at public institution of higher education who qualifies for health care benefits will pay 10 percent of insurance premiums, with remaining 90 percent paid by state. Provides that part-time faculty member at public institution of higher education who qualifies for health care benefits will pay 10 percent of insurance premiums, with remaining 90 percent paid by state.
Title
Relating to employees at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, but with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by Order of the President. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |