OR SB192 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Effective date, September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires pharmacy benefit managers to annually report to Department of Consumer and Business Services information about certain rebates, fees, price protection payments and other payments received from prescription drug manufacturers. Requires pharmacy benefit managers to annually report to Department of Consumer and Business Services information about certain rebates, fees, price protection payments and other payments received from prescription drug manufacturers. Requires department to publish aggregated information received from pharmacy benefit managers on department's website. Requires Prescription Drug Affordability Board to develop, and to report on to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health by September 15, 2024, plan for establishing upper payment limits on certain drugs. Provides that plan must include analysis of how upper payment limits could be implemented by Public Employees' Benefit Board, Oregon Educators Benefit Board, other state-administered health benefits and insurance. Provides that report must include analysis of potential savings or costs for state, insurers, hospitals, pharmacies and consumers. Continuously appropriates moneys in Prescription Drug Affordability Account to department. Modifies requirements for reports submitted to department by prescription drug manufacturers.] Makes confidential and not subject to disclosure information reported by prescription drug manufacturer that includes personally identifiable information about consumer. Expands membership of Prescription Drug Affordability Board. Modifies information that department must provide to board. Limits information that insurer must report to department regarding prescription drugs covered by insurer to coverage provided under health benefit plans. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prescription drugs; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-03SenateEffective date, September 24, 2023.
2023-08-03SenateChapter 466, 2023 Laws.
2023-07-27SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-22HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 13--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Lewis, Mannix, Osborne, Owens, Scharf, Smith G, Wallan; Excused, 7--Boshart Davis, Diehl, Elmer, Morgan, Nguyen H, Reschke, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McIntire.
2023-06-22HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-06-21HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-06-20HouseReferred to Rules.
2023-06-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-06-20SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Knopp.
2023-06-20SenateThird reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 8--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-16SenateCarried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2023-05-04SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2023-04-27SenateWork Session held.
2023-04-12SenateMotion to refer to Committee on Rules carried. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-04-11SenateCarried over to 04-12 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-10SenateCarried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-06SenateSecond reading.
2023-04-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-04-03SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-01-13SenateReferred to Health Care.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB192
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB192/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB192/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB192/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB192/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB192/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB192/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23821
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24108
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24168
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24577
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24622
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66166
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268252
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267963
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268563
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268562
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269613
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268564
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77486
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77618
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77662
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78032
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271912
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271971
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271972
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78872
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78887
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78896
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78982
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80909
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276320
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/276406
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35015
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=572807
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35466
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=587350
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36305
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589050

Bill Comments

feedback