OR SB191 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to study fee-for-service medical assistance recipients' access to health care providers in rural areas of this state. Requires Oregon Health Authority to study fee-for-service medical assistance recipients' access to health care providers in rural areas of this state. Directs authority to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health not later than September 15, 2024. Sunsets January 2, 2025.
Title
Relating to medical assistance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |