OR SB191 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Effective date, July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Effective date, July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Director of the Employment Department to impose penalty of up to 30 percent on overpayment of unemployment insurance benefits due to false statement, misrepresentation or nondisclosure of material fact.
Title
Relating to overpayment of unemployment insurance benefits; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, July 29, 2013. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 703, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLane. |
2013-06-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Ferrioli, Rosenbaum, Shields; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |