OR SB188 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifies that state felony traffic offenses charged in Multnomah County will be heard in court facility in Portland. Clarifies that state felony traffic offenses charged in Multnomah County will be heard in court facility in Portland. Provides that proceedings for violations occurring in east Multnomah County will occur in Gresham court facility. Creates exception to requirement that court proceeding involving person in custody be transferred, absent good cause, from court facility in Gresham to Portland if defendant is not in custody and certain warrants have been vacated or executed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to courts.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-06-10SenateChapter 77, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2021-05-17HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-14SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-13HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Clem, Hayden, Lively, Nearman, Stark.
2021-05-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-11HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-06HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-31SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
2021-03-31SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Robinson; Excused, 2--Manning Jr, Thomsen.
2021-03-25SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-11SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-15SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback