OR SB188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Sunset Review of State Government Boards and Commissions. Directs task force to examine executive branch regulatory boards and commissions to determine effectiveness and efficiency of particular boards and commissions in achieving mission and regulatory objectives. Authorizes task force to make recommendations on sunsetting of boards and commissions or on establishing periodic review of boards and commissions. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to review of state government regulatory entities; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB188 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB188/Introduced |