OR SB186 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Approves modifications to rules of Oregon Criminal Justice Commission. Approves modifications to rules of Oregon Criminal Justice Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Oregon Criminal Justice Commission.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-06-10SenateChapter 76, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2021-05-17HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-13SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-12HouseThird reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 9--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, Hayden, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Zika; Excused, 8--Dexter, Drazan, Evans, Lively, Nearman, Ruiz, Stark, Valderrama.
2021-05-11HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-06HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-03-15HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-10SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
2021-03-10SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2021-03-04SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-04SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-02-11SenateWork Session held.
2021-01-26SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback