OR SB185 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that, and specifies procedures and circumstances under which, members of nonprofit corporation and board of directors of nonprofit corporation may discuss issues or take action by electronic mail or other electronic means without meeting. Provides that, and specifies procedures and circumstances under which, members of nonprofit corporation and board of directors of nonprofit corporation may discuss issues or take action by electronic mail or other electronic means without meeting. Provides that affirmative vote of majority of board of directors to approve action under specified circumstances is act of board of directors and is effective on date specified in electronic mail announcement. Specifies circumstances under which majority of directors may approve dissolution if number of directors in office at time at which directors consider dissolution is less than required by laws of this state or by articles of incorporation or bylaws of nonprofit corporation.
Title
Relating to the governance of nonprofit corporations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 389, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Robinson, Thomsen. |
2021-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 48; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, Heard, Johnson. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |