OR SB184 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Corrections to establish program for selling inmate handicrafts. Removes requirement that handicrafts be sold at department institutions.
Title
Relating to Department of Corrections inmate handicrafts.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Chapter 195, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vial. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Heard, Williamson. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dembrow, Johnson. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Carried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |