OR SB181 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs court to consider, in determining amount of award of attorney fees, whether attorney performed services on pro bono basis or award of attorney fees otherwise promotes access to justice. Directs court to consider, in determining amount of award of attorney fees, whether attorney performed services on pro bono basis or award of attorney fees otherwise promotes access to justice.
Title
Relating to attorney fees.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 325, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wallan. Passed. Ayes, 48; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Anderson, Beyer, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Johnson. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |