OR SB179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to administer program to provide palliative care services and support provision of home- and community-based end of life care. Requires Department of Human Services] Oregon Health Authority to administer program to provide palliative care pilot project to] services and support provision of home- and community-based end of life care. Specifies eligibility, services ,] and provider qualifications and reimbursement. Requires department to report evaluation of pilot project to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022]. Sunsets January 2, 2024.].
Title
Relating to palliative care.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Health Care by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Health Care by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Care by prior reference. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Health Care by prior reference. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |