OR SB177 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that proponent of certain hearsay statements is not required to issue material witness order or seek sanctions for contempt in order to show unavailability of declarant. Establishes exception to prohibition against hearsay evidence, regardless of availability of witness, for certain statements offered against party who engaged in conduct preventing declarant from testifying or causing declarant to refuse to appear or testify.] Provides that proponent of certain hearsay statements is not required to issue material witness order or seek sanctions for contempt in order to show unavailability of declarant. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to hearsay; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-08SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 48; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-20HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-15HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-14SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
2021-04-14SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Boquist, Heard.
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-29SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-17SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback