OR SB176 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates exceptions to certain privileges in abuse proceedings. Creates exceptions to certain privileges in abuse proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to abuse.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-08SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 2--Morgan, Wilde; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-12SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
2021-04-12SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Girod; Excused, 2--Heard, Thomsen.
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-25SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-17SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback