OR SB171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Department of Human Services to remit payments for qualified residential treatment program services for certain children. Prohibits department from placing child or ward in congregate care residential setting in this state if setting is not child-caring agency. Applies to placements occurring on or after September 1, 2019. Prohibits department from placing child or ward in child-caring agency that is not qualified residential treatment program. Creates exceptions. Applies to placements occurring on or after July 1, 2020. Directs department to publish certain information regarding out-of-state placements and update information each month. Describes qualified residential treatment program and requires certain procedures regarding department's placement of child or ward in qualified residential treatment program. Modifies requirements for permanency hearing for children in voluntary placement. Modifies definition of "substitute care." Creates exception to requirement that child-caring agency be incorporated. Directs department and Oregon Health Authority to submit joint report regarding out-of-state placements to interim committees of Legislative Assembly relating to children no later than September 1, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to children; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 26; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist.
2019-06-30HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 2--Evans, Findley; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
2019-06-30HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2019-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-06-18SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-17SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-17SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-14SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-04-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-09SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-04SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Human Services.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB171
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB171/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB171/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB171/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB171/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB171/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB171/House%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB171/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB171/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28662
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28978
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30077
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477650
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30233
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478248
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478270

Bill Comments

feedback