OR SB164 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for taxpayer election of reduced tax rate for certain pass-through nonpassive income on original or amended tax return. Provides that election is revocable. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2015, and before January 1, 2016. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to election of reduced rate of taxation on pass-through income; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Tax Credits. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB164 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB164/Introduced |