OR SB162 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that personal income taxpayer may elect to establish account in Oregon 529 Savings Network through means provided by Department of Revenue. Provides that personal income taxpayer may elect to establish account in Oregon 529 Savings Network through election on tax return form] means provided by Department of Revenue. Directs Department of Revenue to provide means for election on form.] Authorizes Oregon 529 Savings Board to work in coordination with department to provide means for establishment of accounts. Applies to tax returns filed on or after January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to establishment of 529 accounts by taxpayers; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 316, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-03-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 2--Girod, Thomsen; Excused, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Hass, Heard, President Courtney, Wagner. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |