OR SB162 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "business tax credit," as allowed to shareholders of S corporation, to remove Department of Revenue rulemaking authority. Updates list of eligible tax credits. Modifies tax credit allowed for employment-related dependent care expenses to conform to operation of related federal tax credit. Prescribes eligibility requirements for earned income for allowance of credit. Allows nonmarried taxpayer to claim credit. Prohibits payment of interest for refundable portion of credit. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Chapter 638, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Barker. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-03-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |