OR SB1591 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to travel; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to travel; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Effective date, March 16, 2012. | |
2012-03-20 | Chapter 63, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-16 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-06 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-05 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Smith G., Thatcher. | |
2012-03-01 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-29 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-29 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-29 | Hass, Telfer declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney, Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)(Amendments distributed) | |
2012-02-27 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-24 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-17 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2012-02-15 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development, then Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |