OR SB1585 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Consumer and Business Services, Employment Department and Oregon Health Authority to enter into intergovernmental agreement for sharing of information to enable Department of Consumer and Business Services to inform beneficiaries of their rights to workers' compensation death benefits. Directs Department of Consumer and Business Services, Employment Department and Oregon Health Authority to enter into intergovernmental agreement for disclosure of data related to outbreak of COVID-19 in workplaces] sharing of information to enable Department of Consumer and Business Services to inform beneficiaries of their rights to workers' compensation death benefits. Restricts Oregon Health Authority to sharing information regarding deaths from COVID-19 associated with workplace outbreaks published by authority. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to workers' compensation death benefits; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Effective date, March 23, 2022. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 106, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Hieb, Hoy, Ruiz; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Breese-Iverson. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Carried over to February 25, 2022 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2022-02-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Gelser Blouin, Robinson. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |