OR SB1584 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates procedure for filing petition for compensation for wrongful conviction. Creates procedure for filing petition for compensation for wrongful conviction. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to wrongful conviction; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Effective date, March 23, 2022. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 105, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Prusak, Scharf. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Robinson. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation, then Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |