OR SB1583 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to ensure that standardized summative assessments are administered to minimum extent practicable. Directs Department of Education to ensure that standardized summative assessments are administered to minimum extent practicable. Directs department to apply for waiver of federal state assessment requirements. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to summative assessments; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Rachel Armitage [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Effective date, March 23, 2022. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 104, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-01 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Scharf. |
2022-03-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 23--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika. |
2022-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 1, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-25 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Education. |
2022-02-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 7--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Knopp, Thatcher; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Boquist, Linthicum, Manning Jr, Robinson, Thomsen. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |