OR SB1574 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that standards for dual credit programs must establish manner by which students in grades 9 through 12 may earn course credit for both high school and community college or public university. Modifies duties of Accelerated Learning Committee. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to accelerated learning.
Sponsors
Rep. Betsy Close [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2015. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 23, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Komp, Thatcher. |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Education. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Close. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |