OR SB1570 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definitions applicable to pay equity provisions.
Title
Relating to pay equity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/SB1570 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1570/Introduced |