OR SB1566 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies Oregon Promise program to extend eligibility to certain Oregon foster children who attain their highest level of education while in out-of-state placements. Establishes school district residency of individual placed in congregate care residential setting.] Temporarily permits Department of Human Services to close at screening reports of third party child abuse not involving child care providers or schools] child's parent or caregiver, member of child's household, person responsible for child's care, provider of child care or school employee, contractor, agent or volunteer. Directs department to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to child welfare regarding reports closed at screening and to identify resources required to investigate all allegations of third party abuse. Sunsets March 31, 2021. Directs Department of Human Services to adopt rules identifying] allowing up to two family-based group homes to provide services to certain children. Directs department to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to child welfare regarding success of placements in family-based group homes. Sunsets January 1, 2024. Prohibits placement of Oregon children in out-of-state child-caring agency unless child-caring agency is licensed by Department of Human Services. Establishes certain contract requirements and department duties regarding placements of children in out-of-state child-caring agencies. Requires qualified residential treatment programs and psychiatric residential treatment programs to maintain site-specific accreditation from nationally recognized organization. Prohibits colocation of children and youth committed to custody of Oregon Youth Authority without court order. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to children; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2020-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-24SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-24SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-19SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-05SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03SenateInformational Meeting scheduled.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback