OR SB1566 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to seismic information about schools; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to seismic information about schools; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Effective date, July 1, 2012. | |
2012-03-20 | Chapter 61, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-16 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | President signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading. Carried by Berger. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 14--Brewer, Cowan, Freeman, Gilliam, Huffman, Johnson, Richardson, Sheehan, Smith G., Sprenger, Thompson, Weidner, Wingard, Speaker Hanna. | |
2012-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-23 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-20 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-17 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-17 | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-16 | Carried over to 02-17 by unanimous consent. | |
2012-02-15 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-14 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2012-02-13 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |