OR SB1564 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date, March 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date, March 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows governing body of county that declares state of emergency related to cannabis to request that State Department of Agriculture deny issuance of industrial hemp grower licenses in area subject to jurisdiction of county. Allows State Department of Agriculture to, based on supply of and demand for industrial hemp, refuse to issue industrial hemp grower license for amount of time department determines necessary. Requires department to study effects of refusal to issue grower license and to submit report to committee of Legislative Assembly related to agriculture not later than March 30, 2024. Sunsets March 31, 2024.] Allows governing body of county that declares state of emergency related to cannabis to request that State Department of Agriculture deny issuance of industrial hemp grower licenses in area subject to jurisdiction of county. Sunsets June 30, 2023. Renames Task Force on Cannabis-Derived Intoxicants as Task Force on Cannabis-Derived Intoxicants and Illegal Cannabis Production. Increases membership of task force, and expands task force's scope of work. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to cannabis; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Effective date, March 7, 2022. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Chapter 26, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh, Wallan. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 9--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, George, Hayden, Reschke, Smith DB, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Hieb, Hoy, Ruiz; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Breese-Iverson. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Carried over to February 25, 2022 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity. |
2022-02-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Armitage, Lawrence Spence, Patterson. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 1--Lawrence Spence; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Boquist, Linthicum, Manning Jr, Robinson, Thomsen. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |