OR SB1563 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes requirement that students who are not citizens or lawful permanent residents apply for official federal identification document to be eligible for exemption from paying nonresident tuition at public universities. Permits public universities, Oregon Health and Science University and community colleges] Higher Education Coordinating Commission to provide scholarships and other financial aid to students who are not citizens or lawful permanent residents. Permits Oregon Health and Science University and community colleges] to exempt from paying nonresident tuition students who are not citizens or lawful permanent residents. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state benefits for undocumented individuals; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateEffective date, April 13, 2018.
2018-04-17SenateChapter 122, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-13SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
2018-03-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2018 Calendar.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-20HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2018-02-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-19SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2018-02-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow, President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley.
2018-02-16SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-12SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-07SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Education.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback