OR SB1562 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Health Licensing Office to issue sign language interpreter license to qualified applicant. Authorizes Health Licensing Office to issue sign language interpreter license to qualified applicant. Defines "sign language interpreter." Prohibits unlicensed provision of signed language interpretation services. Creates exceptions to prohibition. Allows office to impose discipline for certain violations. Directs office to provide administrative and regulatory oversight to sign language interpreter program. Establishes State Board of Sign Language Interpreters within office. Imposes civil penalty for violation of licensure requirements. Becomes operative January 1, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to sign language interpreters; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |