OR SB1562 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-22)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that person commits crime of strangulation if person knowingly impedes normal breathing or circulation of another person by applying pressure to chest of other person. Increases penalty for crime of strangulation when victim is family or household member. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to classify felony strangulation as crime category 5 if committed against family or household member.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to strangulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateEffective date, January 1, 2019.
2018-04-11SenateChapter 84, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03SenateRules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Salinas, Stark. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Kennemer.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-20HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-20HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-20SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Riley.
2018-02-19SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-16SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-15SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-13SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/SB1562
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1562/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1562/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1562/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1562/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1562/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1562/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27207
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=431952
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27329
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433684
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433922

Bill Comments

feedback