OR SB1559 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that personal property tax returns not required for floating homes unless new property or new improvements have been added to property tax account since preceding assessment year. Provides that personal property tax returns not required for floating homes unless new property or new improvements have been added to property tax account since preceding assessment year. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the taxation of floating homes; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Effective date, June 3, 2022. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 96, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Scharf. |
2022-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2022-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |